+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Left in Rules
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (3-Y 2-N)
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Rules sub: Subcommittee #2
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SJ48E
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Printed as engrossed 18104657D-E
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with amendments by voice vote
On January 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18104657D
- Referred to Committee on Rules