+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On February 26, 2001 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ441ER)
On February 22, 2001 in the Senate:
- House amendment agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On February 22, 2001 in the House:
- Agreed to by House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2001 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (100-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House
- Agreed to by House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Taken up
On February 19, 2001 in the House:
- Reported from Rules with amendment (16-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Placed on Calendar
On February 1, 2001 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Read third time and agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On January 31, 2001 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute 017939528-S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 017939528-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On January 30, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reading waived
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
- Rules suspended (40-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 017939528-S1
On January 29, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with substitute by voice vote
On January 19, 2001 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed 013789528