+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On February 26, 2001 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ425ER)
On February 14, 2001 in the House:
- Agreed to by House (96-Y N-1)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 1-N)
- Taken up
On February 12, 2001 in the House:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
On February 5, 2001 in the Senate:
- Read third time and agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: AGREE TO R (39-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 2, 2001 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 1, 2001 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 31, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reading waived
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
- Rules suspended (40-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2001 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Presented & ordered printed 018680476
+ − Votes (5)
February 14, 2001: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 1-N)
February 12, 2001: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2001: VOTE: AGREE TO R (39-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2001: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2001: Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor