+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 4, 2003 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ401ER)
On January 24, 2003 in the House:
- Agreed to by House
On January 17, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Laid on Speaker's table
On January 16, 2003 in the Senate:
- Taken up
- Engrossed by Senate
- Printed as engrossed 033680518-E
- Agreed to by Senate
- Communicated to House
On January 14, 2003 in the Senate:
- Presented 033680518
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor