+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Tabled in Rules by voice vote
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Placed on Calendar
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Reading waived (38-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate
- Reading waived (38-Y 0-N)
- Read first time
On February 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules (12-Y 3-N)
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16103271D
+ − Votes (3)
February 16, 2016: Reading waived (38-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2016: Reading waived (38-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2016: Reported from Rules (12-Y 3-N)
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor