+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ4ER)
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- Agreed to by House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
On March 11, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 10, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 18, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time and agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Communicated to House
On February 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 11, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On January 14, 1998 in the Senate:
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 12/29/97 982743685
- Referred to Committee on Rules
+ − Votes (3)
March 12, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
March 10, 1998: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N)
February 11, 1998: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor