+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 13, 1995 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ398ER)
On February 23, 1995 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House (Block Vote) (96-Y 0-N)
- Reported from Rules (10-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 21, 1995 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 20, 1995 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived
- Read second time and engrossed
- Rules suspended (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Communicated to House
On February 17, 1995 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules
On February 15, 1995 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed LD5463747
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
- Consent to introduce (38-Y 0-N)