+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 4, 2005 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ393ER)
On February 24, 2005 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- Taken up
On February 23, 2005 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 22, 2005 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 21, 2005 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 18, 2005 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 16, 2005 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 2, 2005 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Read third time
On February 1, 2005 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 31, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: WAIVE READING R (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2005 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On January 12, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Prefiled & ordered printed; offered 01/12/05 057972820
+ − Votes (3)
February 24, 2005: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2005: Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2005: VOTE: WAIVE READING R (40-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor