+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On February 24, 1999 in the House:
- No action taken by Appropriations by voice vote
On February 23, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from General Laws (23-Y 3-N)
On February 8, 1999 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 6
On February 7, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
On February 6, 1999 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 4, 1999 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 991409745-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. 991409745-S1
- Reading waived (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Rec. of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: (39-Y 1-N)
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Communicated to House
On February 3, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 1999 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 991409745-S1
- Reported from Rules with substitute by voice vote
On January 20, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed 992535745
+ − Votes (4)
February 23, 1999: Reported from General Laws (23-Y 3-N)
February 4, 1999: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1999: VOTE: (39-Y 1-N)
February 3, 1999: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor