+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ384ER)
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- House substitute agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Title replaced 13105190D-H1
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- Taken up
- Committee substitute agreed to 13105190D-H1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SJ384H1
- Agreed to by House with substitute 13105190D-H1 BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Reported from Rules with substitute (12-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 13105190D-H1
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Unanimous consent to introduce
- Presented and ordered printed 13103954D
- Referred to Committee on Rules
+ − Votes (4)
February 15, 2013: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2013: Reported from Rules with substitute (12-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2013: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2013: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor