+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On February 26, 2001 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ377ER)
On February 21, 2001 in the House:
- Taken up for immediate consideration
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
On February 19, 2001 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Placed on Calendar
On January 25, 2001 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Read third time and agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On January 24, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Printed as engrossed 014327452-E
On January 23, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reading waived
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (39-Y 0-N)
- Rules suspended (39-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with amendment (12-Y 1-N)
On January 10, 2001 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/10/01 014327452