+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On February 20, 2007 in the House:
- Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
On February 15, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Motion to refer to committee agreed to
On February 14, 2007 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Placed on Calendar
On February 6, 2007 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 076129844-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SJ375S1
- Reading waived (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Communicated to House
On February 5, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived (39-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with substitute by voice vote
- Committee substitute printed 076129844-S1
On January 9, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/07 074426844
+ − Votes (3)
February 14, 2007: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2007: VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2007: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor