+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On August 9, 2001 in the Senate:
- Study Committee Members Appointed
On February 26, 2001 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ371ER)
On February 22, 2001 in the Senate:
- House substitute agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On February 21, 2001 in the House:
- Agreed to by House with substitute (90-Y 9-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (90-Y 9-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute 014412568-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 014412568-H1
- Taken up
On February 20, 2001 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 014412568-H1
On February 19, 2001 in the House:
- Reported from Rules with substitute (11-Y 1-N)
On February 9, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Placed on Calendar
On February 6, 2001 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived
- Reading waived
- Rules suspended (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 014388568-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute 014388568-S1
- Rules suspended (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Communicated to House
On February 5, 2001 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 014388568-S1
- Reported from Rules with substitute by voice vote
On January 10, 2001 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/10/01 019100568
+ − Votes (5)
February 21, 2001: VOTE: ADOPTION (90-Y 9-N)
February 19, 2001: Reported from Rules with substitute (11-Y 1-N)
February 6, 2001: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2001: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2001: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor