+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ37ER)
On March 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendment waived
- House amendment agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On March 3, 1998 in the House:
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Agreed to by House with amendment (98-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 1-N)
On February 27, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from S. T. w/amd. (22-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Science and Technology
On February 18, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time and agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Communicated to House
On February 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 11, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On February 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Rules sub-committee: Studies
On January 14, 1998 in the Senate:
- Presented & ordered printed 987269860
- Referred to Committee on Rules
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
March 3, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 1-N)
February 27, 1998: Reported from S. T. w/amd. (22-Y 0-N)
February 11, 1998: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor