+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ363ER)
On February 26, 2009 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- Taken up
On February 25, 2009 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 23, 2009 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N)
- Subcommittee recommends reporting
On February 16, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned Rules sub: Studies
On February 11, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (39-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On January 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Assigned Rules sub: Studies
On January 14, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented and ordered printed 091533268
+ − Votes (5)
February 26, 2009: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2009: Subcommittee recommends reporting
February 23, 2009: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2009: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2009: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor