+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 2, 1998 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ36ER)
On February 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendments waived
- House amendments agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Title replaced
On February 24, 1998 in the House:
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Agreed to by House with amendments by voice vote
On February 20, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Science and Technology
- Reported from S. T. w/amds. (21-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 17, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Read second time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Title replaced
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Printed as engrossed 982352860-E
- Reading waived (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Communicated to House
On February 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with amendments by voice vote
On February 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Rules sub-committee: Studies
On January 14, 1998 in the Senate:
- Presented & ordered printed 982352860
- Referred to Committee on Rules
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (3)
February 20, 1998: Reported from S. T. w/amds. (21-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1998: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1998: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor