+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ358ER)
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- Agreed to by House
On January 25, 2013 in the House:
- Received
- Laid on Speaker's table
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate
- Agreed to by Senate
On January 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Presented 13101222D
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor