+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (40)
On April 10, 2007 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0843)
On March 26, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned Chapter 843 (effective 7/1/07)
On March 13, 2007 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ354ER)
- Enrolled
On February 22, 2007 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N)
- Taken up
On February 21, 2007 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 20, 2007 in the House:
- Taken up
- Passed by for the day
On February 16, 2007 in the House:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (21-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned P & E sub: #1 (Marshall, R.G.)
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Placed on Calendar
On February 6, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (39-Y 0-N)
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 075589820-S1
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SJ354ES1
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by Senate (37-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: (37-Y 1-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by Senate (38-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: (38-Y 1-N)
- Communicated to House
- Printed as engrossed 075589820-ES1
On February 5, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived (39-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2007 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 075589820-S1
On January 30, 2007 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (13-Y 2-N)
On January 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/07 078182804
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (9)
February 22, 2007: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2007: Reported from Privileges and Elections (21-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2007: VOTE: (38-Y 1-N)
February 6, 2007: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2007: VOTE: (37-Y 1-N)
February 6, 2007: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2007: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2007: Reported from Finance with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2007: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (13-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor