+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 8, 1999 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ332ER)
On February 25, 1999 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 1-N)
- Agreed to by House (Block Vote) (99-Y 1-N)
On February 24, 1999 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 22, 1999 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (24-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 1999 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 1
On February 2, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On February 1, 1999 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On January 29, 1999 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Read third time and agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On January 28, 1999 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 27, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (36-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived (36-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On January 15, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed 993482825
+ − Votes (3)
February 25, 1999: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 1-N)
February 22, 1999: Reported from Courts of Justice (24-Y 0-N)
January 27, 1999: VOTE: (36-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor