+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On February 28, 2009 in the House:
- Left in Rules
On February 19, 2009 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely by voice vote
On February 16, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned Rules sub: Studies
On February 11, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Placed on Calendar
On February 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Read third time
On February 3, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SJ330E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Printed as engrossed 092875212-E
On February 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (39-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with amendments by voice vote
On January 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Assigned Rules sub: Studies
On January 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/09 092875212
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
February 2, 2009: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor