+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On February 27, 2007 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ329ER)
On February 20, 2007 in the House:
- Agreed to by House (78-Y 20-N)
- Taken up
- VOTE: ADOPTION (78-Y 20-N)
On February 19, 2007 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 16, 2007 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 14, 2007 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (13-Y 2-N)
On February 8, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Placed on Calendar
On February 6, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (38-Y 0-N)
- Read second time and engrossed
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On February 5, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived (39-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On January 3, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/07 071961750
+ − Votes (4)
February 20, 2007: VOTE: ADOPTION (78-Y 20-N)
February 14, 2007: Reported from Rules (13-Y 2-N)
February 6, 2007: VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2007: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor