+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ327ER)
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- VOTE: Agree To (99-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N)
- Taken up
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N)
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Placed on Calendar
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time and agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time
On January 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (12-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Presented and ordered printed 21103644D
+ − Votes (4)
February 4, 2021: VOTE: Agree To (99-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2021: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2021: Read third time and agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2021: Reported from Privileges and Elections (12-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor