+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ324ER)
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N)
- Taken up
On February 7, 2011 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 4, 2011 in the House:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Placed on Calendar
On February 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read third time and agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (39-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned to P&E sub: Certificate, Oath and Confirmation Review
On January 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11100048D
+ − Votes (5)
February 8, 2011: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2011: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2011: Read third time and agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2011: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2011: Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor