+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (36)
On March 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ318ER)
On February 28, 2009 in the House:
- VOTE: --- ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N)
On February 28, 2009 in the Senate:
- Conference substitute printed 094224232-S2
- Conference report agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On February 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- House amendment rejected by Senate
On February 26, 2009 in the House:
- Amendment by Delegate Nutter agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Agreed to by House with amendment (95-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: --- ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate acceded to request
On February 26, 2009 in the House:
- House insisted on amendment
- House requested conference committee
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Nutter, O'Bannon, Mathieson
On February 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: Hanger, Puckett, Locke
On February 26, 2009 in the House:
- Taken up
On February 25, 2009 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 23, 2009 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2009 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting
On February 16, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned Rules sub: Studies
On February 11, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Placed on Calendar
On February 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Read third time
On February 3, 2009 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 097308232-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SJ318S1
On February 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (39-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 097308232-S1
- Reported from Rules with substitute by voice vote
On January 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Assigned Rules sub: Studies
On January 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/09 093214232
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (5)
February 28, 2009: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
February 26, 2009: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2009: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2009: Subcommittee recommends reporting
February 2, 2009: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor