+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Continued to Special Session 1 in Rules by voice vote
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Placed on Calendar
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time and agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On January 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 21102905D-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SJ308E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
On January 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (38-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with amendments by voice vote
On January 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented and ordered printed 21102905D