+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ301ER)
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Taken up
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned Rules sub: Subcommittee #1
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Placed on Calendar
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On January 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103005D
+ − Votes (5)
February 20, 2019: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2019: Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2019: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2019: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2019: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor