+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On February 22, 2011 in the House:
- Left in Privileges and Elections
On February 14, 2011 in the House:
- Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (2-Y 3-N)
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned P & E sub: #1 Constitutional
On February 7, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Placed on Calendar
On February 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read third time and agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N)
On January 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (39-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (13-Y 1-N)
On January 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned to P&E sub: Constitutional Amendments, Reapportionment, Referenda
On January 5, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11101709D
+ − Votes (4)
February 14, 2011: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (2-Y 3-N)
February 1, 2011: Read third time and agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N)
January 27, 2011: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2011: Reported from Privileges and Elections (13-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor