+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Rejected by Senate (20-Y 20-N)
- Requires 21 affirmative votes for passage
On January 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (8-Y 7-N)
On January 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13101226D
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
+ − Votes (3)
January 28, 2013: Rejected by Senate (20-Y 20-N)
January 24, 2013: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2013: Reported from Privileges and Elections (8-Y 7-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor