+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ292ER)
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Agreed to by House (94-Y 0-N)
- Taken up
- VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2019 in the House:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Placed on Calendar
On January 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
- Agreed to by Senate except lines 23-24 (37-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N)
- Amendment by Senator Suetterlein rejected (6-Y 33-N)
- Reading of amendment waived
- Engrossed by Senate
- Reading waived (38-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (39-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 0-N)
On January 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100025D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (10)
January 30, 2019: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2019: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2019: Agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2019: Amendment by Senator Suetterlein rejected (6-Y 33-N)
January 21, 2019: Reading waived (38-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2019: Agreed to by Senate except lines 23-24 (37-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2019: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2019: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
January 17, 2019: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N)
January 15, 2019: Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor