+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (44)
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned Chapter 823 (effective 7/1/19)
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0823)
On March 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ278ER)
- Enrolled
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- Reconsideration of conference report agreed to by House
- VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 2-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (96-Y 2-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (94-Y 3-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION #2 (94-Y 3-N)
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed by temporarily
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amended by conference committee
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Delegates: Filler-Corn, Rush, O'Quinn
- Conferees appointed by House
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senators: Reeves, DeSteph, Spruill
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- House requested conference committee
- House insisted on substitute
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- House substitute rejected by Senate (1-Y 39-N)
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Committee substitute agreed to 19106687D-H1
- Taken up
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 1-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SJ278H1
- Agreed to by House with substitute (97-Y 1-N)
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 19106687D-H1
- Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (19-Y 3-N)
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #4
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Placed on Calendar
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SJ278S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 19105271D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 19105271D-S1
- Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (13-Y 0-N 1-A)
On January 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Presented and ordered printed 19101842D