+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Continued to Special Session 1 in Privileges and Elections by voice vote
On February 7, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Placed on Calendar
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate (24-Y 12-N)
- Reading waived (37-Y 0-N)
- Title replaced 21100733D-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SJ270S1
- Chair votes Yea
- Committee substitute agreed to (19-Y 19-N)
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (38-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 21100733D-S1
- Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (9-Y 4-N 2-A)
On July 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100202D