+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ260ER)
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- Taken up
- Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (11-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On November 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13100409D
- Referred to Committee on Rules
+ − Votes (4)
February 15, 2013: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2013: Reported from Rules (11-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2013: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2013: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor