+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On February 22, 2023 in the House:
- Left in Rules
On February 17, 2023 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 1-N)
On February 15, 2023 in the House:
- Assigned Rules sub: Amendments and Other Matters Subcommittee
On February 13, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Placed on Calendar
On February 6, 2023 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Reading waived (39-Y 0-N)
- Printed as engrossed 23100628D-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SJ251E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
On February 3, 2023 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (38-Y 0-N)
- Reported from Rules with amendment by voice vote
On January 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23100628D
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
February 17, 2023: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 1-N)
February 6, 2023: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2023: Reading waived (38-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor