+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On February 9, 1995 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ247ER)
On February 8, 1995 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House (93-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 1995 in the House:
- Reported from N. & C. (7-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Nominations and Confirmations
On February 3, 1995 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 2, 1995 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Reconsideration of passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (39-Y 0-N)
- Read second time and engrossed
- Rules suspended (37-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES (37-Y 1-N)
- Reconsideration of rules suspended (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (38-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived
- Rules suspended (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES (40-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 1, 1995 in the Senate:
- Reading waived
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES (40-Y 0-N)
- Rules suspended (40-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 1995 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 1995 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Presented & ordered printed LD3576661
+ − Votes (9)
February 8, 1995: VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 0-N)
February 7, 1995: Reported from N. & C. (7-Y 0-N)
February 2, 1995: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 2, 1995: VOTE: RECONSIDER (38-Y 0-N)
February 2, 1995: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES (40-Y 0-N)
February 2, 1995: VOTE: RECONSIDER (39-Y 0-N)
February 2, 1995: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES (37-Y 1-N)
February 1, 1995: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES (40-Y 0-N)
January 31, 1995: Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor