+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 3, 2000 in the House:
- Failed to report (defeated) by Rules (8-Y 9-N)
On February 21, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Placed on Calendar
On February 15, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Read second time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Printed as engrossed 007295988-E
- Reading waived (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Communicated to House
On February 14, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with amendment by voice vote
On January 24, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed 007295988
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
March 3, 2000: Failed to report (defeated) by Rules (8-Y 9-N)
February 15, 2000: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2000: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor