+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ239ER)
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- Agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
On March 11, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 10, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (13-Y 1-N)
On March 9, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On March 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
- Taken up for immediate consideration
- Reading waived
- Read second time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Rules suspended (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Communicated to House
- Printed as engrossed 988779739-E
On March 6, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with amendment by voice vote
On February 25, 1998 in the Senate:
- Consent to introduce (37-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (37-Y 0-N)
- Presented & ordered printed 988779739
- Referred to Committee on Rules