+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ228ER)
- House amendments agreed to by Senate
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Agreed to by House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 1-N)
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Taken up
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (99-Y 1-N)
- Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House
- Agreed to by House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION #2 (99-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Reported from Rules with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Placed on Calendar
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time and agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On January 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (39-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On January 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15103034D
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
February 24, 2015: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (99-Y 1-N)
February 24, 2015: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION #2 (99-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2015: Reported from Rules with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2015: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor