+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ224ER)
On March 10, 2018 in the House:
- Agreed to by House
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate
- Engrossed by Senate
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Presented 18107607D
+ − Sponsors (42)
Type:
Primary Sponsor