+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ220ER)
On March 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendments waived
- House amendments agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Title replaced
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- Amendments by Mr. O'Brien agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Agreed to by House with amendments (94-Y 3-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 3-N)
On March 11, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 10, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 19, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 17, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Communicated to House
On February 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On February 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Consent to introduce (37-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONSENT TO INTRODUCE R (37-Y 0-N)
- Presented & ordered printed 984544718
- Referred to Committee on Rules