+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 18, 1994 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ21ER)
On February 25, 1994 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House (Block Vote) (96-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (10-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 15, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 14, 1994 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute
- Reading waived (36-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (36-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Communicated to House
On February 11, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived (39-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 1994 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed LD2322749 (SJ21S1)
- Reported from Rules with substitute
On January 17, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented and ordered printed