+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ207ER)
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Laid on Speaker's table
- Received
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Read third time
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SJ207S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 18107819D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read first time
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 18107819D-S1
- Reported from Rules with substitute by voice vote
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented and ordered printed 18107258D
+ − Sponsors (43)
Type:
Primary Sponsor