+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On February 5, 1997 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ200ER)
On January 31, 1997 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House (95-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 1997 in the House:
- Reported from N. & C. (7-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Nominations and Confirmations
On January 27, 1997 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On January 24, 1997 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (37-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 1997 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 22, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reading waived
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES (39-Y 0-N)
- Rules suspended (39-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 0-N)
On January 8, 1997 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Presented & ordered printed 977499803
+ − Votes (5)
January 31, 1997: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N)
January 30, 1997: Reported from N. & C. (7-Y 0-N)
January 24, 1997: VOTE: PASSAGE (37-Y 0-N)
January 22, 1997: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES (39-Y 0-N)
January 21, 1997: Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor