+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- House amendments agreed to by Senate
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ20ER)
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Taken up
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Agreed to by House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Rules with amendments (17-Y 0-N)
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Rules sub: Subcommittee #2
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reading of substitute waived
- Floor substitute printed 18106558D-S1 (Locke)
- Substitute by Senator Locke agreed to 18106558D-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute SJ20S1
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On January 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On December 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and laid on Clerk's desk; offered 01/10/18 18101784D
- Introduced bill reprinted 18101784D
+ − Votes (3)
March 6, 2018: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
March 1, 2018: Reported from Rules with amendments (17-Y 0-N)
February 27, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor