+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On May 11, 1998 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0770)
On April 21, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned Chapter 770 (effective 7/1/98)
On April 20, 1998 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ2ER)
On April 20, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 20, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Enrolled
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N)
On March 11, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 10, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 18, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Substitute by Sen. Gartlan rejected (17-Y 23-N)
- Floor substitute printed 986639661-S1 (Gartlan)
- VOTE: FLOOR SUBSTITUTE V (17-Y 23-N)
- Reading waived
- Engrossed by Senate
- Rules suspended (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (39-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: AGREE TO R (39-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Passed by temporarily
- Read second time
On February 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read first time
On February 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 1998 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 11/21/97 986560728
+ − Votes (6)
March 12, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
March 10, 1998: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1998: VOTE: FLOOR SUBSTITUTE V (17-Y 23-N)
February 16, 1998: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (39-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1998: VOTE: AGREE TO R (39-Y 0-N)
February 10, 1998: Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor