+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 10, 1998 in the House:
- Letter to House Committee on Health, Welfare &Institutions
On March 9, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by indefinitely in Rules (15-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Rules sub-committee: 3
On February 19, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 18, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time and agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Communicated to House
On February 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 986825655-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. 986825655-S1
On February 11, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 986825655-S1
- Reported from Rules with substitute by voice vote
On February 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Rules sub-committee: Studies
On January 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Presented & ordered printed 986195655
- Referred to Committee on Rules
+ − Votes (2)
March 9, 1998: Passed by indefinitely in Rules (15-Y 0-N)
February 11, 1998: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (32)
Type:
Primary Sponsor