+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 9, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by indefinitely in Rules (9-Y 4-N)
On February 20, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Assigned to Rules sub-committee: 3
On February 19, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 17, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Printed as engrossed 987573666-E
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Communicated to House
On February 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with amendments by voice vote
On February 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Rules sub-committee: Studies
On January 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Presented & ordered printed 987573666
- Referred to Committee on Rules
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
March 9, 1998: Passed by indefinitely in Rules (9-Y 4-N)
February 17, 1998: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1998: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor