+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ190ER)
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- Agreed to by House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
On March 11, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 10, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Assigned to Rules sub-committee: 3
On February 19, 1998 in the House:
- Communicated to House
On February 17, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Title replaced
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Printed as engrossed 988658358-E
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On February 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with amendments by voice vote
On January 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Presented & ordered printed 988658358
- Referred to Committee on Rules