+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On February 17, 2006 in the House:
- Continued to 2007 in Privileges and Elections by voice vote
On February 15, 2006 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
On February 14, 2006 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SJ180S1
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 069220712-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Reading waived (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 13, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 069220712-S1
On February 9, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2006 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Presented and ordered printed 068876129
- Introduced at the request of Governor
+ − Votes (5)
February 14, 2006: VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2006: VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2006: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2006: Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor