+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On March 10, 1998 in the House:
- Letter to House Committee on Education
On March 9, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by indefinitely in Rules (11-Y 3-N)
On February 20, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Rules sub-committee: 3
On February 19, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 18, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time and agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Communicated to House
On February 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 11, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On February 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Rules sub-committee: Studies
On January 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Presented & ordered printed 982822745
- Referred to Committee on Rules
+ − Votes (2)
March 9, 1998: Passed by indefinitely in Rules (11-Y 3-N)
February 11, 1998: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor