+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- Motion for pending question rejected
- Pending question, not ordered
- Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to
- Rereferred to Rules
- No action taken by Rules
On March 11, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 10, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Rules with substitute (5-Y 4-N)
- Committee substitute printed 981216657-H1
On February 19, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 18, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time and agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Communicated to House
On February 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 11, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On January 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Presented & ordered printed 983260843
- Referred to Committee on Rules
+ − Votes (2)
March 10, 1998: Reported from Rules with substitute (5-Y 4-N)
February 11, 1998: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor